Heiden v. Boffeil et al

Plaintiff: Robert D Heiden
Defendant: Jana Hacker, Jane Doe, Dr David Richter, John Doe, Karen Anderson, Linda Boffeil and Patricia Dettbarn
Case Number: 3:2018cv03068
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
0 Judge: Kelly Mahoney
1 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 5 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00455. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE PSLC notified, NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff. Modified on 12/7/2018 to edit text. (src)
December 4, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/4/2018. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.]
November 28, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Robert D Heiden. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.]
November 28, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D Heiden. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.]
November 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert D Heiden. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiden v. Boffeil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr David Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Boffeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Dettbarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Heiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?