United States of America v. Thirty-three (33) Firearms
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thirty-three (33) Firearms
Case Number: 3:2019cv03002
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0924
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McLaughlin, Martin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Return of Warrant of Arrest in rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (McLaughlin, Martin)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 01/15/19. (Attachment #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (eUSM) (kfs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #2 Receipt Confirmation) (kfs).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET Annotation: Please find new forfeiture case packet attached (kfs)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: No conflicts identified (kfs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in rem against Thirty-three (33) Firearms, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 4/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thirty-three (33) Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirty-three (33) Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin J McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?