Bittner v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Judith A Bittner
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv03008
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case and all related deadlines shall be stayed until 6/25/2019. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 6/28/2019, regarding the status of the case and the extent to which further proceedings will be necessary. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/25/2019. (mmc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Weston, J)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition at Law and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Weston, J)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Weston, J)
March 6, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/27/2019. (mmc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (mmc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Judith A Bittner. (mmc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cerro Gordo County, case number LACV071518. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2888298), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Scheduling Report due by 5/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Table of Contents, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 LR Rule 81.a Statement) (Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bittner v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A Bittner
Represented By: Judith M O'Donohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?