Guillon v. Manson Northwest Webster School District et al

Plaintiff: Becky Guillon
Defendant: Manson Northwest Webster School District, Justin Daggett and Brett Larson
Case Number: 3:2019cv03015
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the presiding judge. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Justin Daggett, Brett Larson, Manson Northwest Webster School District. (Craig, Jason) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (pac).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESISTANCE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Becky Guillon. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Parker, Blake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Justin Daggett, Brett Larson, Manson Northwest Webster School District (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Kolbe, Emily)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline filed by Manson Northwest Webster School District, Brett Larson, and Justin Daggett: Defendants may have to and including 6/7/2019 to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/29/2019. (pac)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline by Defendants Justin Daggett, Brett Larson, Manson Northwest Webster School District (Craig, Jason)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M Craig on behalf of Justin Daggett, Brett Larson, Manson Northwest Webster School District. (Craig, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Guillon. Manson Northwest Webster School District served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Parker, Blake)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Guillon. Justin Daggett served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Parker, Blake)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Guillon. Brett Larson served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Parker, Blake)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Justin Daggett, Brett Larson, Manson Northwest Webster School District. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/19/2019. (pac)
April 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2922112), filed by Becky Guillon. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Blake) Modified text on 4/19/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillon v. Manson Northwest Webster School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manson Northwest Webster School District
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Daggett
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Larson
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Guillon
Represented By: Blake Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?