American General Life Insurance Company v. One Vision et al
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Elizabeth Wilkinson, Charles Marr, Michael W Marr and One Vision
Case Number: 3:2019cv03016
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 One Vision's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, Elizabeth Wilkinson by One Vision.(Davison, Collin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by One Vision (Davison, Collin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Collin Michael Davison on behalf of One Vision. (Davison, Collin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy B Boyea on behalf of Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted, on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 6/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (nef to Atty Boyea and non-ecf defts) (des)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy B. Boyea ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2955844) by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Amy B. Boyea) (Olson, Ethan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. One Vision waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (des)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, and Elizabeth Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Answer) (NEF mailed to Dfts)(skm)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry of the Court by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text and name of attachment on 4/24/2019 (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #1 Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company - Redacted Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, One Vision, Elizabeth Wilkinson. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
April 24, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys Ethan Olson and Michael Thrall - none found. (des)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Interpleader against American General Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2925550) filed by American General Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealed Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Sealed Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. One Vision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Vision
Represented By: Collin Michael Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ethan S Olson
Represented By: Michael W Thrall
Represented By: Amy B Boyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?