Plaas, Inc. v. New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC et al
Plaintiff: Plaas, Inc. and Plaas, Inc
Defendant: New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC, New Heaven Chemicals, Inc. and New Heaven Chemicals, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03029
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaas, Inc re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint upon New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC's Plant Manager (Eastburn, Benjamin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaas, Inc re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint upon New Heaven Chemicals, Inc.'s Plant Manager (Eastburn, Benjamin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaas, Inc re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint upon New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC (Eastburn, Benjamin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaas, Inc re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint upon New Heaven Chemicals, Inc. (Eastburn, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 UNRESISTED Motion to Extend Time to Answer filed by New Heaven Chemicals, Inc and New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC: Defendants may have to and including 8/20/2019 to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/12/2019. (pac)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 UNRESISTED Motion for Extend Time to Answer by Defendants New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC, New Heaven Chemicals, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lawrence, Jason)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendant may refile such motion in compliance with Local Rules within ten (10) days hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/10/2019. (mmc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unresisted by Defendants New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC and New Heaven Chemicals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lawrence, Jason) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (pac).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen E Schemenauer (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2970945) and #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin D Eastburn (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2970948). Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds that these motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Stephen E Schemenauer and Benjamin D Eastburn are authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Plaas, Inc. (ECF Registration Form from both attorneys due by 7/15/2019). Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019. (pac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin D. Eastburn ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2970948) by Plaintiff Plaas, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Blatnick, Samuel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen E. Schemenauer ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2970945) by Plaintiff Plaas, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Blatnick, Samuel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC and New Heaven Chemicals, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/14/2019. (pac) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/17/2019 to include clerk's signature) (pac).
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (pac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Plaas, Inc. (Blatnick, Samuel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2960005.), filed by Plaas, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 9/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blatnick, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaas, Inc. v. New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Heaven Chemicals Iowa LLC
Represented By: Jason Ray Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Heaven Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Heaven Chemicals, Inc
Represented By: Jason Ray Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaas, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel L Blatnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaas, Inc
Represented By: Samuel L Blatnick
Represented By: Benjamin D Eastburn
Represented By: Stephen E Schemenauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?