Gully v. Luc et al

Plaintiff: Brad Gully
Defendant: James Stubbs, Webster County, Iowa, Brad Luc and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv03032
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) SCHEDULING Order (Sec 1983): Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Narrative Written Statement due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019. (mmc) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (mmc).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by John/Jane Doe, Brad Luc, James Stubbs, Webster County, Iowa.(Palmer, Jason)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Gully. Brad Luc served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Boles, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Gully. James Stubbs served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Boles, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams. Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John/Jane Doe, Brad Luc, James Stubbs, Webster County, Iowa. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
June 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (conflicts checked, non found) (jjh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Brad Gully (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2964216), filed by Brad Gully. Scheduling Report Deadline 9/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boles, Matthew) Corrected deadline on 6/20/2019 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gully v. Luc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Gully
Represented By: Matthew Mark Boles
Represented By: Christopher Clark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stubbs
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster County, Iowa
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Luc
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?