United States of America v. Glock GMBH, Model 19, 9mm Pistol
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Glock GMBH, Model 19, 9mm Pistol
Case Number: 3:2019cv03034
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0924
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McLaughlin, Martin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Return of Warrant of Arrest in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (McLaughlin, Martin) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit text. (src)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Warrant for Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest in Rem) (ksy)
July 11, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in rem against Glock GMBH 9MM PISTOL, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Glock GMBH, Model 19, 9mm Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock GMBH, Model 19, 9mm Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin J McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?