Simmer v. Praetorian Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dale Simmer
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv03037
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #3 Complaint by Praetorian Insurance Company.(O'Brien, Sean) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (skm).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Praetorian Insurance Company (O'Brien, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2019. (skm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Dale Simmer. (skm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet. (skm)
July 22, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cerro Gordo County, case number LACV071725. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2983079), filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 9/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (O'Brien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmer v. Praetorian Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Simmer
Represented By: James T Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?