Greenwood v. Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas E Greenwood
Defendant: Trans Union LLC and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03039
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin C Poling (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-3021115): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds that the motion should be granted. It is ordered that Attorney Colin C Poling is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC (ECF Registration Form due by 10/1/2019). Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2019. (pac)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin C. Poling ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3021115) by Defendant TransUnion, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sealey, Patrick)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Sealey, Patrick)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TransUnion, LLC.(Sealey, Patrick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J Lyons Jr (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-3000710): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Thomas J Lyons, Jr is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas E Greenwood. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2019. (pac)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J Lyons Jr ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3000710) by Plaintiff Thomas E Greenwood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lyons, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
August 12, 2019 FEE Receipt: $ 400.00, receipt number IAN110025269 for Civil Filing Fee by Thomas E Greenwood (ksy)
August 9, 2019 Set Fee Date Deadline: $400 filing fee due by 8/15/2019. (pac)
August 9, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Trans Union LLC filed by Thomas E Greenwood. Scheduling Report due by 11/6/2019. (Marks, Samuel) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (pac). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/12/2019 to include signature page) (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwood v. Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Patrick L Sealey
Represented By: Colin C Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Greenwood
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?