Units v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kelsey Darlene Units
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv03036
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelsey Darlene Units. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagenaar, Ronald)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Silverman, Marisa)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kelsey Darlene Units. Dismissal Deadline 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (des)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/20/2020. (des)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kelsey Darlene Units (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Wagenaar, Ronald)
August 19, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Units v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Represented By: Marisa Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Darlene Units
Represented By: Ronald J Wagenaar
Represented By: Ronald James Wagenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?