Buscher v. Citizens Community Credit Union
Plaintiff: Lisa Buscher
Defendant: Citizens Community Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2021cv03007
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Citizens Community Credit Union (Baier, Kelly)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended State Court Petition by Citizens Community Credit Union.(Baier, Kelly) Modified on 3/17/2021 to fix text and add link to #3 Amended State Court Petition (des)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New Civil Removal Actions packet attached. (skm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lisa Buscher. (skm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lisa Buscher. (skm)
March 11, 2021 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm)
March 11, 2021 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/31/2021. (skm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in Kossuth County, case number LACV027536. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3405704), filed by Citizens Community Credit Union. Scheduling Report due by 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Rule 81) (Baier, Kelly) Modified to remove duplicate text from attachments on 3/11/2021 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buscher v. Citizens Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Buscher
Represented By: Whitney C Judkins
Represented By: Brooke Catherine Timmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Community Credit Union
Represented By: Nancy A Wood
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?