Titan Pro SCI, Inc v. Morris
Plaintiff: Titan Pro SCI, Inc
Defendant: Jeffrey Morris
Case Number: 3:2021cv03036
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Titan Pro SCI, Inc by Jeffrey Morris.(Morehead, Sander)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to re #4 MOTION Expedited Discovery filed by Titan Pro SCI, Inc. (Carter, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION Expedited Discovery filed by Jeffrey Morris. (Morehead, Sander)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy R Shattuck on behalf of Defendant Jeffrey Morris. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney registers for NextGen by 12/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2021. (eAtty Shattuck) (des)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tim R. Shattuck ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3569475) by Defendant Jeffrey Morris (Morehead, Sander)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Plaintiff must serve the proposed order on Defendant. Defendant will have until 11/22/2021 to reply to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/12/2021. (mmc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sander J Morehead on behalf of Jeffrey Morris. (Morehead, Sander)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Titan Pro SCI, Inc (Carter, Elizabeth)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff Titan Pro SCI, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9) (Carter, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Titan Pro SCI, Inc. Jeffrey Morris served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Carter, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Morris. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
November 8, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
November 8, 2021 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2021 (des)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Morris ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3562568.), filed by Titan Pro SCI, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 2/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) (Carter, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titan Pro SCI, Inc v. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titan Pro SCI, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Carter
Represented By: Adam R Foresman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Morris
Represented By: Timothy R Shattuck
Represented By: Sander J Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?