Prescott v. Alem, et al.
Plaintiff: Roxanne Renee Prescott
Defendant: Rabi Mohmmad Walid Al Alem, MSR Transport, LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc, Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon Data Services, Inc, Amazon KYDC, LLC, Amazon Retail, LLC, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Mohammad Walid Al Alem and Mohd Walid Al Alem
Case Number: 3:2022cv03019
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Set Deadline: Defendants Esurance Insurance Company and Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/6/2022. (pac)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Robert McConkey on behalf of Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (McConkey, Nathan)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Rabi Mohmmad Walid Al Alem.(Bevel, Henry)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Mohammad Walid Al Alem.(Bevel, Henry)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J Bevel, III on behalf of Mohammad Walid Al Alem. (Bevel, Henry)
July 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J Bevel, III on behalf of MSR Transport, LLC. (Bevel, Henry)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roxanne Renee Prescott. Rabi Mohmmad Walid Al Alem served on 7/6/2022, answer due 7/27/2022. (Hillers, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roxanne Renee Prescott. Mohammad Walid Al Alem served on 7/6/2022, answer due 7/27/2022. (Hillers, Thomas) Modified text on 7/12/2022 (pac).
July 5, 2022 Set Deadline: Defendant MSR Transport, LLC's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/28/2022. (pac)
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Amazon Data Services, Inc, Amazon KYDC, LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc, Amazon Retail, LLC, Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon.com Services, LLC (Nafisi, Arman)
June 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case as a potential conflict has been discovered. (pac)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by MSR Transport, LLC.(Bevel, Henry)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Amazon Data Services, Inc, Amazon KYDC, LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc, Amazon Retail, LLC, Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Nafisi, Arman)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New case packet attached. (jjh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Roxanne Renee Prescott (jjh)
June 13, 2022 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2022. (jjh)
June 13, 2022 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Palo Alto County, case number 03741 LACV026949. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3696679), filed by Amazon. Scheduling Report due by 8/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Document, #3 Exhibit A - Petition at Law, #4 Exhibit B - Docket, #5 Declaration) (Nafisi, Arman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescott v. Alem, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Renee Prescott
Represented By: Christopher Sandy
Represented By: Thomas L Hillers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabi Mohmmad Walid Al Alem
Represented By: Henry J Bevel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSR Transport, LLC
Represented By: Henry J Bevel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Data Services, Inc
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon KYDC, LLC
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Retail, LLC
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan Robert McConkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan Robert McConkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Walid Al Alem
Represented By: Henry J Bevel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohd Walid Al Alem
Represented By: Henry J Bevel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?