Northern Natural Gas Company v. Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4 et al
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Defendant: 0.0161 acres, more or less, located in Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4, 0.1676 acres, more or less, located in Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SE/4 SW/4, Arlyn D. Tenold, as Trustees of the Arlyn and Judith Tenold Revocable Trust, Judith A Tenold, as Trustees of the Arlyn and Judith Tenold Revocable Trust, Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4, Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SE/4 SW/4, Arlyn D Tenold and Judith A Tenold
Case Number: 3:2022cv03044
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1358 Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #14 Stipulation of Dismissal (jag)
February 8, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Natural Gas Company re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal AMENDED to correct title of document (Mahlberg, Patrick)
February 8, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Natural Gas Company re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal (Mahlberg, Patrick)
February 8, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Northern Natural Gas Company (Mahlberg, Patrick)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Case Settlement: The court has been advised that this action has been settled. The parties shall have to and including, the date listed at end of this docket entry, to file their settlement documents. Dismissal Papers Deadline are due by 2/27/2023 Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 01/27/2023. (klh)
January 27, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Order, by Northern Natural Gas Company (Mahlberg, Patrick)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Natural Gas Company re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Expedited and for Immediate Use and Possession and supporting documents (Leonard, Brant)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Expedited and for Immediate Use and Possession filed by Northern Natural Gas Company. The Court will take no action until plaintiff provides proof that all relevant documents (summons, complaint, motion for summary judgment, etc.) have been properly served on the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/26/2023. (jag)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Natural Gas Company. Arlyn D Tenold served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023; Judith A Tenold served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Mahlberg, Patrick)
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Natural Gas Company on Defendants Judith and Arlyn Tenold (Mahlberg, Patrick) Modified text and contacted attorney on 1/3/2023 directing this be filed as a summons returned executed (jag)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Expedited and for Immediate Use and Possession by Plaintiff Northern Natural Gas Company Responses due by 1/17/2023 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix, #4 Affidavit) (Mahlberg, Patrick)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick DJ Mahlberg on behalf of Plaintiff Northern Natural Gas Company. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2022. (des)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
December 27, 2022 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Northern Natural Gas Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent BHE Pipeline Group, LLC, Corporate Parent NNGC Acquisition, LLC, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Energy Company for Northern Natural Gas Company. (Leonard, Brant)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Northern Natural Gas Company of Condemnation (Leonard, Brant)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Mahlberg ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3822652) by Plaintiff Northern Natural Gas Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Leonard, Brant)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3822643.), filed by Northern Natural Gas Company. Scheduling Report due by 3/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leonard, Brant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Natural Gas Company v. Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Represented By: Brant M Leonard
Represented By: Patrick DJ Mahlberg
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.0161 acres, more or less, located in Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.1676 acres, more or less, located in Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SE/4 SW/4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlyn D. Tenold, as Trustees of the Arlyn and Judith Tenold Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A Tenold, as Trustees of the Arlyn and Judith Tenold Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SW/4 SE/4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township 99N, Range 22 West Section 29: SE/4 SW/4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlyn D Tenold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A Tenold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?