Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC v. Palo Alto County, IA et al
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Palo Alto County, IA, Palo Alto County Board of Supervisors, Keith B Wirtz, Craig Merrill, Roger Faulstick, Ronald D Graettinger and Linus Solberg
Case Number: 3:2024cv03006
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 60101 Pipeline Safety Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Stay: This case is stayed pending resolution of two appeals in related matters now before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Pending deadlines are cancelled. Defendants are ordered to notify this Court within seven days of any ruling by the Eighth Circuit in either of these pending appeals. The Court will enter an order setting a deadline for a proposed scheduling order, if necessary, thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 2/22/2024. (des)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 UNRESISTED MOTION to Stay Due to Pending Eighth Circuit Appeal in Related Cases by Defendants Roger Faulstick, Ronald D Graettinger, Craig Merrill, Palo Alto County Board of Supervisors, Palo Alto County, IA, Linus Solberg, Keith B Wirtz (Craig, Jason)
February 9, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roger Faulstick, Ronald D Graettinger, Craig Merrill, Palo Alto County Board of Supervisors, Palo Alto County, IA, Linus Solberg, Keith B Wirtz.(Craig, Jason)
January 30, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Ronald D Graettinger served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Roger Faulstick served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Palo Alto County, IA served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Palo Alto County Board of Supervisors served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Linus Solberg served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Keith B Wirtz served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Craig Merrill served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SCS MgmtCo, LLC, Corporate Parent Summit Carbon Holdings, LLC for Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 22, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 , #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Brian D Boone, Karla M Doe and Michael R Hoernlein on behalf of Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions LLC. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the Court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2024. (des)
January 22, 2024 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
January 22, 2024 Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 4/18/2024 (des)
January 22, 2024 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/12/2024 (des)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Hoernlein by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dublinske, Bret)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karla M. Doe by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dublinske, Bret)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Boone by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dublinske, Bret)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4081761.), filed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dublinske, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC v. Palo Alto County, IA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brant M Leonard
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Kristy Rogers
Represented By: Nicci M Ledbetter
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Represented By: Karla M Doe
Represented By: Michael R Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto County, IA
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B Wirtz
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Merrill
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Faulstick
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D Graettinger
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linus Solberg
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?