United States v. Grote et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Richard Grote, Debbie Grote, Franklin County Treasurer's Office and Iowa Department of Revenue
Case Number: 3:2024cv03014
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 IRS: Action to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard Grote served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Bailey, Alan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Debbie Grote served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Bailey, Alan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Franklin County Treasurer's Office waiver sent on 3/14/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Bailey, Alan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Iowa Department of Revenue waiver sent on 3/14/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Bailey, Alan)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Franklin County Treasurer's Office, Debbie Grote, Richard Grote, Iowa Department of Revenue ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (jag)
March 1, 2024 Chief Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. Scheduling Report due by 5/29/2024 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Grote et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Alan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Treasurer's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?