Symonds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Quinn Symonds
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Ssaogcomms
Case Number: 3:2024cv03053
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2025 DOCKET Annotation re #7 Administrative Record/Transcript Social Security: Hard Copy received in S.C. Clerk's Office. (klh)
February 20, 2025 Filing 8 SOCIAL Security Briefing Schedule Order: Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and Local Rule 16(h). Plaintiff's Brief due by 3/19/2025. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025. (ksy)
February 20, 2025 Set Deadline: Check Status Deadline for hard copy of transcript due by 2/26/2025. (ksy)
February 19, 2025 Filing 7 SOCIAL Security Transcript filed beginning with part 1 of 21 by Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 transcript 2 of 21 - Court Transcript Index, #2 transcript 3 of 21 - Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 transcript 4 of 21 - Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 transcript 5 of 21 - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 transcript 6 of 21 - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 transcript 7 of 21 - Non Disability Related Development, #7 transcript 8 of 21 - Disability Related Development, #8 transcript 9 of 21 - Medical Records Part 1, #9 transcript 10 of 21 - Medical Records Part 2, #10 transcript 11 of 21 - Medical Records Part 3, #11 transcript 12 of 21 - Medical Records Part 4, #12 transcript 13 of 21 - Medical Records Part 5, #13 transcript 14 of 21 - Medical Records Part 6, #14 transcript 15 of 21 - Medical Records Part 7, #15 transcript 16 of 21 - Medical Records Part 8, #16 transcript 17 of 21 - Medical Records Part 9, #17 transcript 18 of 21 - Medical Records Part 10, #18 transcript 19 of 21 - Medical Records Part 11, #19 transcript 20 of 21 - Medical Records Part 12, #20 transcript 21 of 21 - Medical Records Part 13) (Doroba, Sophie)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Doroba on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Doroba, Sophie)
December 31, 2024 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in social security cases. (pac)
December 31, 2024 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Quinn Symonds. (pac)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and to notify the Commissioner of the commencement of the action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to the appropriate office within the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney for the district where the action is filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/31/2024. (pac)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/31/2025. (ksy)
December 31, 2024 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (ksy)
December 31, 2024 Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules of Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (pac)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Quinn Symonds (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Social Security, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symonds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Symonds
Represented By: John P Lander
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sophie Doroba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ssaogcomms
Represented By: Ssaogcomms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?