McFarland v. McFarland et al

Plaintiff: Burns H McFarland
Defendant: Robin McFarland, Dori Groenendyk and Robin's School Of Dance & Tumbling
Case Number: 5:2008cv04047
Filed: June 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 260 Bill of Costs filed by Rhonda Van Es, Robert Van Es. Costs are taxed in favor of Robert Van Es and Rhonda Van Es in the amount of $1,920.84. The Clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in such amount in favor of Robert Van Es and Rhonda Van Es. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/15/11. (Copy w/NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff) (djs)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Granting (219) Motion for Summary Judgment: Granting (220) Motion for Summary Judgment: Granting (221) Motion for Summary Judgment: Denying (227) Motion to Strike: Denying (253) Motion to Strike: Judgment shall enter accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 09/20/11. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-04047-MWB, 5:09-cv-04047-MWB (Copy w/NEF to Pro Se Plaintiff)(kfs)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 179 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Denise Harrison (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/26/2010. (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des) Modified on 7/26/2010 to note copy to atty Joseph Thornton (des).
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting 116 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Stacey Hofer-Ahrenstorff. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/04/10. (Copy with NEF to pro se Plaintiff Burns F McFarland) (kfs)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in its entirety 103 Motion to Dismiss defendant Randy Waagmeester. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 2/25/2010. (copy w/nef to non-ecf attorney) (des)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Attorney Beatty's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the plaintiff; granting 142 Motion for Joinder in Waagmeester's resistance; granting 144 Motion for Joinder in Waagm eester's resistance; granting 148 Motion for Joinder in Waagmeester's resistance; granting 149 Motion for Joinder in Waagmeester's resistance; denying 152 Motion to Quash; denying 153 Motion to Amend; granting 155 Motion for Joinder in Waagmeester's resistance. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 02/09/2010. (src)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in its entirety 102 Motion to Dismiss (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/19/2010. (des)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Kim Scorza's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court concludes that, because Scorza was court-appointed to assist in making a custody determination, she is immune from suit. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/02/09. (src)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 68 , 87 Motions to Dismiss parties without prejudice. Defendants Sharon Foughty, Sandy Hoekstra, Kristin Plueger, Karissa Ann Rozeboom, Madison Rozeboom, David Vander Werf, Rebecca Vander Werf, Brenda Schuitmen, and Mary Zeutenhorst are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Paul A Zoss on 8/25/09. (des)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying plaintiff's MOTION 67 to amend Complaint; granting defendants' MOTIONS 25 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 33 , 36 , 39 , 41 , 42 , 47 , and 54 , for more definite statement; granting in part and denying in part MOTION 64 to dismiss or alternatively for more definite statement; taking under advisement MOTIONS 26 , 40 , 48 , and 55 , to strike portions of the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Paul A. Zoss on 8/10/09. (tjf)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Denying 7 Motion to Dismiss - Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/16/09. (Copy with NEF to pro se Plaintiff) (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. McFarland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burns H McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dori Groenendyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin's School Of Dance & Tumbling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?