Omaha Steaks International v. Midwest Best Choice Distributors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Omaha Steaks International
Defendant: Corrie Gatlin, Midwest Best Choice Distributors LLC, Frontier Choice Steaks LLC, Chad Davis, Frontier Speciality Meats, LLC, G&G Partners, Homestead Steaks, LLC, Midwest Choice Distributors LLC, Midwest Steak LLC, Melissa Gatlin, Bart Augustin Marcules and Akin Terrell
Case Number: 5:2013cv04095
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONSENT Judgment granting 47 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Remaining Defendants. The Remaining Defendants shall, in accordance with 15 USC Section 1118, deliver up to Omaha Steaks for destruction all items which in any way or man ner depict the Omaha Steaks Trademarks and/or any marks substantially similar to the Omaha Steaks Trademarks, whether such items are used alone or in association with other words or symbols, and the Remaining Defendants shall show this Court proof of the same within 10 days of the issuance of this Consent Judgment or subsequent Order requiring such proof. Final judgment shall enter accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 2/27/14. (copy w/nef mailed to non-ecf parties) (djs)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying 25 Motion to Dismiss: Denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 01/07/14. (Copy w/NEF mailed to pro se Defendants) (kfs)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Omaha Steaks International (See Order Text). Within ten (10) business days of the date of this Order, the Defendants shall file with the Clerk of Court written cert ification of their compliance with the terms of this Order. Plaintiff Omaha Steaks International is hereby required to deposit a cash bond in the amount of $100.00 as security for this Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 12/10/2013. (copy w/nef mailed to non-ecf parties) (des)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omaha Steaks International v. Midwest Best Choice Distributors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrie Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Best Choice Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Choice Steaks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Speciality Meats, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&G Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Steaks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Choice Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Steak LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Augustin Marcules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akin Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Steaks International
Represented By: Brian T McKernan
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?