Roeder et al v. DIRECTV, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Roeder and Christopher Grill
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc and DIRECTV, LLC
Case Number: 5:2014cv04091
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Ida
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 142 Joint Motion to Approve FLSA Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/19/17. (djs)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment on the claims of Plaintiff Roeder; denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment on the claims of Plaintiff Grill; denying 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 75 Motion to Strike the statement of Kevin Jackson; granting 83 Motion for Leave to File statements of additional facts and appendices out of time (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/13/2017. (des)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order denying in its entirety 13 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and denying as moot 20 Motion for Time Within Which To Seek Leave To Amend Complaint Should The Court Grant Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 9/22/2015. (des)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roeder et al v. DIRECTV, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Roeder
Represented By: Nathan T Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Grill
Represented By: Nathan T Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?