Klingenberg et al v. Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC et al--DEFT GP INTERNATIONAL CO LLC TERMED WITH #107 ORDER
Plaintiff: Klingenberg, Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg
Defendant: Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC, GP International Co LLC and GP International Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv04012
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Unresisted Joint Motion for Entry of Order re Partial Satisfaction of Judgment re #150 Amended Judgment. Defendants have partially satisfied the #150 judgment entered against it in this case in the total amount of $670,523.08. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall issue partial satisfaction of judgment as set out in this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 4/15/2020. (skm)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 UNRESISTED Joint Motion for Entry of Order re Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Stamp, David) Modified text on 4/15/2020 (skm).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #167 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall S. Borek on behalf of Defendants GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney completes NextGen Registration by 2/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2020. (eAttorney Borek) (kms)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall S. Borek ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3126382) by Defendants GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lederer, Gregory)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MANDATE of USCA as to #151 Notice of Appeal filed by GP International Company, GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA LLC: In accordance with #164 opinion and #165 judgment of 08/29/2019, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued (des)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 JUDGMENT of USCA as to #151 Notice of Appeal, filed by GP International Company, GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. It is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the #164 opinion of this Court. (src)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPINION of USCA as to #151 Notice of Appeal, filed by GP International Company, GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. The judgment is affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Counsel, #2 Correspondence to Publisher)(src)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals Notice of Appeal filed 04/06/2018 Doc No #151 . Appeals court case number: 18-1742. Notification to print: #161 Order on Motion for Protective Order, #159 MOTION for Protective Order , #162 Agreed Protective Order. (src)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 AGREED PROTECTIVE Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 5/25/2018. (src)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #159 Motion for Protective Order. The court will separately enter the revised protective order agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 5/25/2018. (src)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 CLERK'S Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals RE: #151 Notice of Appeal (kfs)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Confidentiality and Protective Order) (Lederer, Gregory)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take RE: #154 Transcript of Status Conference, #155 Transcript of Hearing on Motion for New Trial, #156 Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and #157 Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference (kfs)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference held on 09/11/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 05/17/2018: Redacted Transcript ddl 05/29/2018: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 07/25/2018 (kfs)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial held on 07/13/16 before Judge Mark W Bennett: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 05/17/2018: Redacted Transcript ddl 05/29/2018: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 07/25/2018 (kfs)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motion for New Trial held on 01/05/18 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 05/17/2018: Redacted Transcript ddl 05/29/2018: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 07/25/2018 (kfs)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Status Conference held on 08/16/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 05/17/2018: Redacted Transcript ddl 05/29/2018: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 07/25/2018 (kfs)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 USCA Case Number 18-1742 for #151 Notice of Appeal: Transcript ddl 05/16/2018 (Attachment #1 Correspondence) (kfs)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals RE: #151 Notice of Appeal: Case Number ddl 04/09/18 (kfs)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Appeal as to #150 Clerk's Judgment, #149 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0862-2671913. (Lederer, Gregory)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 AMENDED Judgment on Jury Verdict in favor of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg against Defendants GP International Company and Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Signed by Clerk and Approved By Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/9/2018. (des)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA (See Order Text). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter an amended final judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/9/2018. (des)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Filing of Court Exhibit 1001 (filed as such pursuant to KEM chambers) (des)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Motion Hearing held on 01/05/2018 RE: #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law: Ruling reserved: Order to follow (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (kfs)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Setting Hearing on #128 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2018 9:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (1st Floor) Sioux City before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/5/2018. (src)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF to #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial filed by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company and Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (kfs)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ***TEXT ORDER ONLY*** granting #142 Motion for Leave to File overlength reply brief for good cause shown. The Clerk of Court shall file the over length reply brief (Doc. 142-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/21/2017. (KEM)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 (DOCKETED IN ERROR: This document has been added an attachment to #142 ): Proposed Reply Brief in Support of #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by by GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 11/21/2017 (kfs)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2017: #1 Proposed Brief) (kfs).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESISTANCE to #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 5A) (des)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The Clerk of Court shall file the over length brief and exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/16/2017. (des)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 #5 Exhibit 3A #6 Exhibit 4 #7 Exhibit 4A #8 Exhibit 5 #9 Exhibit 5A) (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 11/14/2017 (kfs)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part #137 Motion to Strike #136 Supplemental Brief: Plaintiffs' Response to #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law due by 11/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/09/17. (kfs)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Strike #136 Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg: Response ddl 11/22/2017 (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief in Support of #128 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 11/06/2017 (kfs)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #129 Motion by Defendants for Leave to File supplemental briefing upon receipt of transcript of trial. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/31/2017. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take RE: #130 Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 1 of 4, #131 Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 2 of 4, #132 Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 3 of 4 and #133 Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 4 of 4 (kfs)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 4 of 4 held on 09/28/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction: After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 11/20/2017: Redacted Transcript ddl 11/30/2017: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 01/28/2018 (kfs)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 3 of 4 held on 09/27/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction: After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 11/20/2017: Redacted Transcript ddl 11/30/2017: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 01/28/2018 (kfs)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 2 of 4 held on 09/26/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction: After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 11/20/2017: Redacted Transcript ddl 11/30/2017: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 01/28/2018 (kfs)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume 1 of 4 held on 09/25/17 before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler: Telephone Number: 712-233-3846: Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction: After that date it may be obtained through PACER: Redaction Request ddl 11/20/2017: Redacted Transcript ddl 11/30/2017: Release of Transcript Restriction ddl 01/28/2018 (kfs)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File - Supplement Their Brief in Support of Their Post-Judgment Motions by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC Responses due by 11/13/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of law or Alternatively for New Trial) (Lederer, Gregory)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #122 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment. Execution of judgment shall be stayed for ten days, at which time the stay will be lifted unless Defendants have posted a supersedeas bond in the full judgment amount. Upon the filing by Defendants Vulcan and GP International of a supersedeas bond in the amount of $2,434,000, execution of the judgment shall be stayed until this court has resolved Defendants Vulcan and GP Internationals post-trial motions for a new trial and for judgment as a matter of law. While the stay is in effect, the Klingenbergs may not execute the judgment or institute any proceedings to enforce the judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/25/2017. (des)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY by GP International Company and Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC to #125 Resistance to #122 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment (Lederer, Gregory) Modified to add link on 10/19/2017 (kfs)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESISTANCE to Motion re #122 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 BILL of Costs by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg Responses due by 11/1/2017 (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 (THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN ADDED AS AN ATTACHMENT TO #122 ): Brief in Support of #122 Motion to Stay filed by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 10/12/2017 (kfs)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2017: #1 Brief) (kfs).
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Granting #120 Motion to Contact Jurors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/06/17. (kfs)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Contact Jurors by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT On Jury Verdict in favor of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg against Defendants Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC, and GP International Company. Signed by Clerk and Approved By Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/29/2017. (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RECEIPT For Exhibits: Exhibits marked 1, 2 were released to Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg. Exhibits must be kept in their original form until termination of any appeal in this matter as stated in LR 83E(e), (f), and (g) (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 WITNESS & Exhibit List from Jury Trial Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg v Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC and GP International Company (Attachments: #1 Sealed Court Exhibit 1001 video on clerks exhibit drive, #2 Sealed Court Exhibit 1002 video on clerks exhibit drive, #3 Sealed Court Exhibit 1003, #4 Sealed Court Exhibit 1004 audio on clerks exhibit drive, #5 Plaintiff Exhibit 1, #6 Plaintiff Exhibit 2, #7 Plaintiff Exhibit 4, #8 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5A, #9 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 1, #10 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 2, #11 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 3, #12 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 4, #13 Sealed Plainitff Exhibit 5B Part 5, #14 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 6, #15 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 7, #16 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5B Part 8, #17 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5C, #18 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5D, #19 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5E, #20 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5F, #21 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5G, #22 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5H, #23 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5I, #24 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5J, #25 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5K Part 1, #26 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5K Part 2, #27 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5L, #28 Sealed Plaintiff Exhibit 5M, #29 Plaintiff Exhibit 6, #30 Plaintiff Exhibits 7, 8, 9, 11, #31 Plaintiff Exhibits 12, 13A, 13B, 14A, 14B, 14C, 14D, 14E, 14F, 14G, 14H, 14I, 14J, 14K, 14L, 14M, 14N, 15A, 15B, 15C, 15D, 15E, 15F, 16A, 16B, #32 Defendant Exhibits A, B, D, E, F, G, I, J) (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JURY QUESTION to the Court and COURT'S ANSWER to the jury. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted, #2 Court's Answer) (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JURY VERDICT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants (Attachments: #1 Unredacted) (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JURY QUESTION to the Court and COURT'S ANSWER to the jury (Attachments: #1 Court's Answer) (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 INSTRUCTIONS To The Jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/28/2017. (des)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Day 4 Jury Trial held on 9/28/2017. Court authorizes Clerk of Court to order lunch for jurors. Verdict: For Plaintiff (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (des)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Day 3 Jury Trial held on 9/27/2017. (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (des)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUROR NOTE to the Court (Attachments: #1 Unredacted) (des)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Day 2 Jury Trial held on 9/26/2017 (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (des)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AMENDED ORDER RE: #105 Minute Entry:. All claims against Defendant GP International Co LLC are dismissed with prejudice and Defendant GP International Co LLC is dismissed as a Defendant in this case: Plaintiffs' implied warranty of merchantability claim contained in Count 4 of #11 Amended Complaint is also dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 09/27/17. (kfs)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re #105 Minute Entry. All claims against Defendant GP International Company are dismissed with prejudice, and GP International Co LLC, is dismissed as a Defendant in this case; and, Plaintiffs implied warranty of merchantability claim contained in Count 4 of #11 Amended Complaint is also dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/26/2017. (des)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Peremptory Challenges for Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg v. Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC and GP International Company (des)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Pretrial Conference and Day 1 Jury Trial held on 9/25/2017. (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (des)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OBJECTIONS to Designation of Deposition to be Read at Trial (Pottebaum) filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/25/2017 (kfs)
September 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to #98 Order and Instructions filed by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 09/25/2017 (kfs)
September 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED Final Pretrial Order (see #101 Order on Unresisted Motion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/24/2017. (KEM)
September 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #99 Unresisted Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/24/2017. (KEM)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to Jury Instructions RE: #98 Order filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/22/2017 (kfs)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 UNRESISTED Motion for Corporate Defendants by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Regarding Court's Proposed Jury Instructions (September 21, 2017 Version): Responses due no later than 5:00 PM on 09/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 09/21/17. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2 #3 Attachment 3) (kfs)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION Re: Demonstrative Aids filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/21/2017 (kfs)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE to Court's Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg RE: #94 Order (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/20/2017 (kfs)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #69 Motion in Limine; granting #70 Motion under 104(a); and granting #71 Motion in Limine. See order text for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/19/2017. (src)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Regarding Court's Proposed Jury Instructions: See text of Order for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 09/15/17. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (kfs)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINAL PRETRIAL Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/13/2017. (src)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/11/2017. Order to follow re #69 , #70 and #71 Motions in Limine. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Megan Rett Merritt terminated as counsel of record for the reason stated in the motion at Doc. 90 that Ms. Merritt is departing the law firm of Lederer Weston Craig, PLC. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 09/12/2017. (Gollhofer, Jami)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Merritt, Megan)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED Verdict Form by Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/08/2017 (kfs)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED Verdict Form filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 09/08/2017 (kfs)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STATEMENT of Facts by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 104(A) filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET Annotation: One binder Defendants Trial Exhibits received in SC clerks office and forwarded to KEM chambers (des)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRIAL BRIEF by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Granting #74 Motion for Additional Discovery: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 09/05/17. (kfs)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Proposed Voir Dire by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET Annotation: One binder Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits received in SC clerk's office and forwarded to KEM chambers this date (des)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESISTANCE to Motion re #74 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Discovery filed by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lederer, Gregory)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESISTANCE to #70 Motion Pursuant to Rule 104(A) filed by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Lederer, Gregory)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - Granting #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Resist Plaintiff's #70 104(a) Motion filed by GP International Company, GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Defendants shall have to and including 8/31/2017, to file a response to #70 Plaintiffs' MOTION Pursuant to Rule 104(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 8/30/2017. (src)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Resist Plaintiff's #70 104a Motion by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Merritt, Megan)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Resist Plaintiff's #70 104a Motion by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Merritt, Megan) Modified text to add link on 08/30/2017 (kfs)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESISTANCE to Motion re #69 MOTION in Limine filed by GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. (Lederer, Gregory)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Response to Motion re #71 MOTION in Limine filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Discovery by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 09/25/2017 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (1st Floor) Sioux City before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/11/2017 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (1st Floor) Sioux City before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 09/08/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 08/16/17. (kfs)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/16/2017. (Court Reporter - FTR Gold) (src)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION in Limine by Defendants GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Merritt, Megan)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 104(A) filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan) Modified text on 08/15/2017 (kfs)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION in Limine by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 08/16/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: See text of Order for further Instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 08/10/17. (kfs)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties GP International Co LLC, GP International Company, Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/9/2017. (src)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to Take Depositions. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 08/04/2017. (jjh)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION leave to take depos for use at trial by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Resetting Hearing - The final pretrial conference, scheduled before Chief United States Magistrate Judge C.J. Williams for September 12, 2017, at 3:00 PM, will now be held, by phone, on that same date and time, with the undersigned presiding. The court will initiate the conference call, but the parties must advise the court of the contact numbers for each party and counsel who will participate at least 3 days before the final pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/2/2017. (src)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying as moot #56 Motion for Default Judgment against G P International Company. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/20/2017. (des)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by GP International Company (Dimitt, Megan)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by GP International Co LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Amended) by Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rett Dimitt on behalf of GP International Company. (Dimitt, Megan)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #11 Amended Complaint, by GP International Company.(Lederer, Gregory)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of GP International Company. (Lederer, Gregory)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Default Judgment against G.P. International Company by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 **TEXT ORDER ORDER"" granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Compliance. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 08/12/2016. (Mastalir, Roger)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit filed by GP International Co LLC and Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan) Modified text on 08/12/2016 (kfs)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT by Counsel by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiffs' Attorney Janece Valentine by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Stamp, David)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney David Stamp by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Stamp, David)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Eashaan Vajpeyi by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Stamp, David)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #41 Unresisted Motion for Leave To Take Depositions for Use at Trial. The court reminds the parties that, so long as they are in agreement, they need not ask the court permission to reschedule depositions. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/13/2016. (Gill, Jennifer)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Continue Trial. Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 28 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 21 days before FPTC. Motions in Limine 28 days before FPTC. Jury Trial reset for 9/25/2017 09:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Mark W Bennett. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/12/2017 03:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2017. Attorney Affidavits due by 8/12/2016. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/13/2016. (des)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark W Bennett: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 re #40 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg. Order to follow. (src)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER ONLY Setting Hearing on Motion #40 MOTION to Continue Trial. A telephonic hearing on this motion is scheduled for 7/13/2016 09:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Mark W Bennett. The court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/12/2016. (Gill, Jennifer)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESISTANCE to Motion RE: #40 Motion to Continue Trial Conditional Resistance filed by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 UNRESISTED Motion for leave to take depositions for use at trial by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Continue Trial by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion for Summary Judgment, see order text for details, and denying #26 Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Expert Stephen Fornier. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/22/2016. (src)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATUS Report Order. Plaintiffs shall file another status report when it learns that the Chinese government has served G P International or otherwise learns any material information regarding efforts to serve the company. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 6/17/2016. (des)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS Report Third by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT of Facts re #25 Motion for Summary Judgment, #33 Reply to Response to Motion Supplement by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Lederer, Gregory)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Hearing on #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #26 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Stephen Fournier: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Mark W Bennett. The defendants shall initiate the conference call for these oral arguments. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/27/16. (djs)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Stephen Fournier filed by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. (Dimitt, Megan)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GP International Co LLC, Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts) (Dimitt, Megan) Modified on text 05/26/2016 (kfs)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESISTANCE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix) (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Response to Motion re #26 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Stephen Fournier filed by Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Appendix) (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file another status report either (a) when service on G.P. International Company is complete or (b) on 06/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 04/12/16. (kfs)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to May 18, 2016, for plaintiff to file a response to defendant's #25 Motion for Summary Judgment and #26 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 4/8/16. (CJW)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline as to #25 Motion for Summary Judgment and #26 Motion to Exclude Testimony: Response ddl 05/18/2016: Action taken pursuant to #28 Text Order (kfs)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Def Motions for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Testimony of Stephen Fournier by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATUS Report by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Stephen Fournier by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Appendix) (Dimitt, Megan)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC Responses due by 4/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix) (Dimitt, Megan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case. (des)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Plaintiffs shall file another status report either (a) when service on G.P. International Company is complete or (b) on April 10, 2016, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 02/09/2016. (src)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATUS Report Re Service of G.P. International Company by Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mark E Parsky as to Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC; Granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Paul V Kaulas as to Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/15. (kfs)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion For Extension of Time to Serve G P International Co LLC and G P International Company. However, on or before 2/10/2016 plaintiffs shall file a status report concerning their efforts to serve G P Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/10/2015. (des)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul V. Kaulas ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2151818) by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lederer, Gregory)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark E. Parsky ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2151809) by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lederer, Gregory)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time Service by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Vajpeyi, Eashaan)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER w/Jury Demand to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant GP International Co LLC.(Dimitt, Megan) Modified text on 09/09/2015 (kfs).
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of GP International Co LLC. (Lederer, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rett Dimitt on behalf of GP International Co LLC. (Dimitt, Megan)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER w/Jury Demand to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC.(Dimitt, Megan) Modified text on 09/09/2015 (kfs)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Jeffrey Klingenberg (Stamp, David) Modified text on 09/02/2015 (kfs)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Defendants G.P. International Company, GP International Co LLC and Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment #1 New Removal Case Packet) (kfs)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED Complaint w/Jury Demand filed against Defendants Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC, GP International Co LLC and G.P. International Company filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (No conflicts identified as to judges, parties and attorneys per the addition of 2 new Defendants) (kfs)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 08/11/15. (kfs)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 State Court Petition by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg, Jennifer Klingenberg (Stamp, David)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 28 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 21 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 28 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 09/12/2016 at 9:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Mark W Bennett: Final Pretrial Conference set for 08/30/2016 at 3:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 08/25/2016. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 05/29/15. (kfs)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 5/27/2015 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 7/24/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 7/24/2015. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 8/27/2015. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 10/27/2015. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 11/27/2015. Discovery due by 1/27/2016. Motions due by 3/25/2016. Trial Ready Deadline 7/27/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 5/27/2015. (des)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation: Clerk's letter of availability of Magistrate Judge with AO85 Consent form. (ksy)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC (Dimitt, Megan)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC.(Lederer, Gregory)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Notice of Removal case packet attached (kfs)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE Court Petition w/Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Klingenberg and Jennifer Klingenberg (kfs)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Clay County, case number LACV029481. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-1968131), filed by Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 6/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (St. Court), #4 Exhibit C - Local Rule 81.A) (Lederer, Gregory)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Judge Mark W Bennett and Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand added: No conflicts identified as to judges, parties and attorneys (kfs)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 03/18/2015 (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klingenberg et al v. Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC et al--DEFT GP INTERNATIONAL CO LLC TERMED WITH #107 ORDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Ladder USA, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Randall S Borek
Represented By: Mark E Parsky
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Represented By: Paul V Kaulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP International Co LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP International Company
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Randall S Borek
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klingenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Klingenberg
Represented By: David W Stamp
Represented By: Eashaan Vajpeyi
Represented By: Janece Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Klingenberg
Represented By: David W Stamp
Represented By: Eashaan Vajpeyi
Represented By: Janece Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?