Farmers Cooperative Society Sioux Center Iowa v. Leading Edge Pork LLC
Plaintiff: Farmers Cooperative Society Sioux Center Iowa
Defendant: Leading Edge Pork LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv04034
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Presiding Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 8/15/2017. (skm)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Strike. Granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court shall enter judgment in favor of FCS on its breach of contract claim, in the amount of $18,406.60, to be made payable from the court-attached funds currently held by the Clerk of Court. Assessment of all other damages and determination of the merits of Leading Edge's counterclaims remain pending for trial. Denying 70 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 7/20/2017. (pac)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 61 Show Cause Hearing. The court has determined that sanctioning Sawers and Weinberg is not appropriate. The 57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sawers is granted. See text of Order. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 05/10/2017. (jjh) Modified to add motion text on 5/10/2017 (jjh).
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Add an Additional Defendant . FCS will be permitted to assert the cause of action currently alleged in Count V of its proposed Second Amended Complaint. FCS will not be permitted to amend its complaint to assert a claim against Legred in his individual capacity. Amended Complaint due by 12/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 11/23/16. (djs)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Status Report filed by Farmers Cooperative Society Sioux Center Iowa. See text of Order. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 9/16/2016 (eCRF). (skm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Cooperative Society Sioux Center Iowa v. Leading Edge Pork LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Cooperative Society Sioux Center Iowa
Represented By: Allyson C Dirksen
Represented By: Lance D Ehmcke
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leading Edge Pork LLC
Represented By: Michael M Sawers
Represented By: Justin P Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?