Black Soil Dairy, LLC v. Land O'Lakes, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Black Soil Dairy, LLC
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc and Ridley USA Inc
Case Number: 5:2017cv04065
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Presiding Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Land O'Lakes, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor Land O'Lakes, against Black Soil and terminate all outstanding motions. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 10/19/2018. (jjh)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 49 Motion to Strike 42 Motion for Summary Judgment (Affidavit of Dr Julian Olson, DVM, and Supporting Documents) and 44 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert by Plaintiff Black Soil Dairy, LLC. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 10/1/2018. (skm)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 9/27/2018. (pac)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 5/22/2018. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Soil Dairy, LLC v. Land O'Lakes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Stanley J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridley USA Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Soil Dairy, LLC
Represented By: William H Larson
Represented By: Jenny L Winterfeld
Represented By: Brian L Yung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?