McCall v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Plaintiff: Kellie M McCall and Kellie McCall
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2018cv04069
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Monona
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2018. (pac)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 UNRESISTED Motion for Additional Time by Defendant Fresh Express Incorporated (Zaiger, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Zaiger on behalf of Fresh Express Incorporated. (Zaiger, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Zaiger on behalf of Fresh Express Incorporated. (Zaiger, Mark) Modified on 10/1/2018 per phone call from law office (jjh).
September 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF of Service by Kellie M McCall. Fresh Express Incorporated served on 8/14/2018. (Arato, Benjamin) Modified text on 8/22/2018 (pac).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Marler on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 08/17/2018. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Marler ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2754809) by Plaintiff Kellie M McCall (Arato, Benjamin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fresh Express Incorporated. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case) (src)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Complaint with jury demand against Fresh Express Incorporated, filed by Kellie M McCall. (Arato, Benjamin)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fresh Express Incorporated. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/6/2018. (pac)
August 7, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Fresh Express Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2748182.), filed by Kellie M McCall. Scheduling Report due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Wandro, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie M McCall
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Benjamin Granfield Arato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie McCall
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Benjamin Granfield Arato
Represented By: William D Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?