Scholz Design Texas, LLC et al v. Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Scholz Design Texas, LLC., Brown Wegher Construction, Inc., Plan Pros, Inc., Scholz Design Texas, LLC, Brown Wegher Construction, Inc and Plan Pros, Inc
Defendant: Tammy Griese, Troy Griese Construction, Inc., Troy Griese Properties, LLC., Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc., Robert Egan, US LBM Holdings, LLC., Troy Griese, Daniel Fesler, Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc, Troy Griese Construction, Inc, US LBM Holdings, LLC, Troy B Griese, Daniel Lampert Fesler, Robert K Egan, Tamara K Griese and Troy Griese Properties, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv04074
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines: Defendants, Troy Griese Properties, LLC and Troy Griese Construction Inc's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/29/2018. Action taken pursuant to #12 & #13 . (src)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC. Troy B Griese waiver sent on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (LeJune, Dana)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC. Troy Griese Construction, Inc waiver sent on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (LeJune, Dana)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC. Troy Griese Properties, LLC waiver sent on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (LeJune, Dana)
October 3, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brown Wegher Construction, Inc, Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC. Tamara K Griese waiver sent on 8/29/2016, answer due 10/28/2016. (LeJune, Dana)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET Annotation re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Hopkins: Pro Hac Vice filing fee of $75.00 receipt #0862-2764284 by attorney Robert Gainer captured by pay.gov on 8/30/2018 at 12:27:36. Pay.gov also captured Pro Hac Vice filing fee of $75.00 receipt #0862-2764288 on 8/30/2018 at 12:33:57. Therefore, receipt #0862-2764288 for $75.00 for the Pro Hac Vice filing fee is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 8/31/2018 and Clerk's approval on 9/5/2018. (skm)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 , #7 , and #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Dana LeJune, Scott Francis, and Michael Hopkins are authorized to appear as counsel on behalf of plaintiffs Scholz Design Texas, LLC, Plan Pros, Inc., and Brown Wegher Construction, Inc. CM/ECF registration for attorney Scott Francis due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 9/4/2018 (conflicts checked; none found) (copy w/NEF and registration form eFrancis). (skm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Hopkins ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2764288) by Plaintiffs Brown Wegher Construction, Inc, Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Gainer, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Francis ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2762943) by Plaintiffs Brown Wegher Construction, Inc, Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standings) (Gainer, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana LeJune ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2762936) by Plaintiffs Brown Wegher Construction, Inc, Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing) (Gainer, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Brown Wegher Construction, Inc, Plan Pros, Inc, Scholz Design Texas, LLC (Gainer, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Complaint: Complaint Filing Fee of $400.00 receipt #0862-2759640 by attorney Robert Gainer captured by pay.gov on 8/23/2018 at 15:28:57. Pay.gov also captured Complaint Filing Fee of $400.00 receipt #0862-2759710 by attorney Robert Gainer on 8/23/2018 at 15:39:48. Therefore, receipt #0862-2759710 for $400.00 Complaint Filing Fee is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 8/24/2018 and Clerk's Approval on 8/24/2018. (skm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: AO 121 and #1 Complaint w/Exhibits mailed to Register of Copyrights (des)
August 24, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiffs LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 9/14/2018 (des)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert K Egan, Daniel Lampert Fesler, Tamara K Griese, Troy B Griese, Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc, Troy Griese Construction, Inc, Troy Griese Properties, LLC, US LBM Holdings, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
August 24, 2018 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2759710.), filed by Brown Wegher Construction, Inc., Plan Pros, Inc., Scholz Design Texas, LLC.. Scheduling Report due by 11/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Gainer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholz Design Texas, LLC et al v. Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scholz Design Texas, LLC.
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Wegher Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plan Pros, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scholz Design Texas, LLC
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Scott M Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Wegher Construction, Inc
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Scott M Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plan Pros, Inc
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Scott M Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Griese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Griese Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Griese Properties, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US LBM Holdings, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Griese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lampert Yards - US LSM, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Griese Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US LBM Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy B Griese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lampert Fesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara K Griese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Griese Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?