Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tamara Anne Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv04076
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Anne Williams. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Forker, Wilford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (mml)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Tamara Anne Williams. Dismissal Deadline 12/12/2018. Filed by Clerk per Order at #3 . (mml)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 8/31/2018. (mml)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/29/2018. (des)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tamara Anne Williams (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford)
August 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Anne Williams
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?