Mehrer v. Synthes North America, Inc
Plaintiff: Lori Mehrer
Defendant: Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA) and Synthes North America, Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv04095
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Synthes North America, Inc.(Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (pac).
December 7, 2018 Answer due from Defendant Synthes North America Inc on 12/21/18: Action taken pursuant to 8 Order (kfs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #7 Defendant's Unresisted Motion for extension of time to respond to removed petition. The Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is extended to December 21, 2018. The parties are reminded of Local Rule 7(i), the rule regarding an expedited relief request, and are encouraged to file expedited relief motions in the future when a deadline is scheduled to expire on or near the date the motion to request an extension is filed. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/06/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Removed Petition by Defendant Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Synthes North America, Inc Notice of Service of Assignment to Magistrate (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate) (Penner, Nancy)
November 30, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2018. (pac)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Attached to this entry is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Lori Mehrer. (pac)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/30/2018. (pac)
November 30, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 LR 81 Statement by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA) (Penner, Nancy) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ksy).
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Plymouth, case number LACV038665. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2822842), filed by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA). Scheduling Report due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Original Notice, #2 Petition, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Penner, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehrer v. Synthes North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA)
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes North America, Inc
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Mehrer
Represented By: William Jeremiah Hale
Represented By: Joel M Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?