Orr v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jerri Lynn Orr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv04097
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerri Lynn Orr. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Forker, Wilford)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jerri Lynn Orr. Dismissal Deadline 3/27/2019 (clerk filed per #2 Order). (skm)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/14/2018. (skm)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerri Lynn Orr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford)
December 12, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added: No conflicts identified: #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerri Lynn Orr
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?