Heyl Truck Lines, Inc et al v. Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Plaintiff: Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc., Heyl Truck Lines Inc and Van Wyk Inc
Defendant: Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv04099
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven G. Emerson and granting #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas H. Davis on behalf of Defendant Haldex Brake Products Corporation. Check Status Deadline set for 2/8/2019 to ensure attorneys sign up for CM-ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/25/2019. Order/NEF emailed to non-ecf attorneys. (src)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven G. Emerson ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2856998) by Defendant Haldex Brake Products Corporation (Morehead, Sander)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas H. Davis ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2856929) by Defendant Haldex Brake Products Corporation (Morehead, Sander)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Haldex Brake Products Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Haldex Aktiebolag for Haldex Brake Products Corporation. (Morehead, Sander)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Haldex Brake Products Corporation.(Morehead, Sander)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Corporate by Van Wyk Inc (Daane, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Corporate by Heyl Truck Lines Inc (Daane, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***TEXT ORDER*** granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sara E. Schroeder (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2837080) by Plaintiffs Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/09/2019. (KEM)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***TEXT ORDER*** granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David L. Edwards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 01/09/2019. (KEM)
January 2, 2019 Pursuant to the filing of #5 Summons Returned Executed, answer due from Haldex Brake Products Corporation on 1/11/2019. (pac)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc. Haldex Brake Products Corporation served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Daane, James) Modified text on 1/2/2019 (pac).
December 26, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiffs' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/11/2019. (pac)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Haldex Brake Products Corporation. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
December 26, 2018 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). #2 and #3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. (pac)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sara E. Schroeder ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2837080) by Plaintiffs Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc. (Daane, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David L. Edwards ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2837075) by Plaintiffs Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc. (Daane, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Demand against Haldex Brake Products Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2837068.), filed by Heyl Truck Lines, Inc, Van Wyk, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 3/21/2019 (Daane, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyl Truck Lines, Inc et al v. Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heyl Truck Lines, Inc
Represented By: James N Daane, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Wyk, Inc.
Represented By: James N Daane, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heyl Truck Lines Inc
Represented By: David Lindsay Edwards
Represented By: John D Mayne
Represented By: James N Daane, II
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Wyk Inc
Represented By: David Lindsay Edwards
Represented By: John D Mayne
Represented By: James N Daane, II
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Represented By: Steven G Emerson
Represented By: Thomas H Davis
Represented By: Sander J Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?