Shaffer v. Garloff et al
Plaintiff: Kim Shaffer and Kim A Shaffer
Defendant: Allan Garloff and Wanda Garloff
Case Number: 5:2019cv04013
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the presider. No conflicts identified. (src)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESISTANCE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Kim A Shaffer. (Kahler, Brant)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Kim A Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kahler, Brant)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/25/2019, Check Status on MJ Consent due by 6/25/2019.), MOTION to Stay by Defendants Allan Garloff, Wanda Garloff (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Bovee, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kim A Shaffer. Wanda Garloff waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Van Loon, Haley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kim A Shaffer. Allan Garloff waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Van Loon, Haley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/9/2019. (ksy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allan Garloff, Wanda Garloff. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
April 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (Conflicts reviewed as to parties and attorneys, none found) (ksy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2913953.), filed by Kim Shaffer. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Van Loon, Haley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. Garloff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Garloff
Represented By: Michael R Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Garloff
Represented By: Michael R Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Shaffer
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: Thomas Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim A Shaffer
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: Thomas Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?