Shaffer v. Tewes et al
Plaintiff: Kim Shaffer and Kim A Shaffer
Defendant: Mark Tewes and Bryan Tewes
Case Number: 5:2019cv04014
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Judge CJ Williams added (no conflicts identified). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider to case. (pac)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED Complaint against Bryan Tewes, Mark Tewes, filed by Kim A Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kahler, Brant)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim by Plaintiff Kim A Shaffer, Counter Defendant Kim A Shaffer Responses due by 7/17/2019 Check Status on MJ Consent due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim) (Kahler, Brant)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim A Shaffer. Bryan Tewes served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Van Loon, Haley)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim A Shaffer. Mark Tewes served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Van Loon, Haley)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Kim A Shaffer by Bryan Tewes, Mark Tewes.(Gray, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline for 5/9/2019. (src)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bryan Tewes and Mark Tewes. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (src)
April 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. Attorney admissions verified for Attorneys Kahler, Van Loon and Story. IPM report verified for $400 new civil case filing fee. (src)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2914019.), filed by Kim Shaffer. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Van Loon, Haley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. Tewes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Shaffer
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: Thomas Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim A Shaffer
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: Thomas Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tewes
Represented By: John C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Tewes
Represented By: John C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?