MicroSource, LLC et al v. Eco World Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC and MicroSource, LLC
Defendant: Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC and Thomas Stanton
Case Number: 5:2019cv04016
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 *TEXT ORDER* ORDER granting #23 Motion to Seal Document. Defendants' Exhibits A and C attached to the Declaration of Thomas Stanton may be filed under seal. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 7/9/2019. (skv)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Thomas Stanton, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text and names of attachments on 7/8/2019 (des)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Seal Document by Defendants Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton (Harty, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A McGuire on behalf of All Defendants. (McGuire, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #16 Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Answer deadline extended to 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/14/19. (ksy)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consented by Defendants Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton (Harty, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eco World Group, LLC (Harty, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eco Agro Resources, LLC (Harty, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: Answer deadline extended for Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC and Thomas Stanton to 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 06/10/2019. (jjh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton, filed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (jjh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerks Office is directed to detach and file the Amended Complaint attached at Doc. 13-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 06/03/2019. (jjh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. Thomas Stanton served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Holst, Luke)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (Motion Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC, MicroSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended and Supplemental Complaint, #2 Redline of Amended and Supplemental Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 - 420 Patent, #4 Exhibit 2 - 306 Patent, #5 Exhibit 3 - 008 Patent, #6 Exhibit 4 - 108 Patent, #7 Exhibit 5 - 231 Patent, #8 Exhibit 6 - Patent Assignment Pages) (Holst, Luke)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (Motion unopposed) filed by Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC, MicroSource, LLC. Plaintiff's shall file an amended motion electronically attaching to the motion and filed under the same docket entry the proposed supplemental complaint.Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2019. (See order text) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/28/19. (ksy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (Motion unopposed) by Plaintiffs Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC, MicroSource, LLC (Holst, Luke)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: '420 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2: '306 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3: '008 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4: '108 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5: '211 Patent Application, #6 Exhibit 6: Patent Assignment Pages) (Holst, Luke)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (des)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC, MicroSource, LLC identifying Corporate Parents Gavilon Global Ag Holdings, LLC, The Gavilon Group, LLC, Marble Gold V, LLC, Gavilon Agriculture Investment, Inc, Marubeni America Corporation, Marubeni Corporation (Holst, Luke)
May 6, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Eco Agro Resources LLC LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/25/2019 (des)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. Eco Agro Resources, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Holst, Luke)
April 24, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Eco World Group LLC LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2019 (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. Eco World Group, LLC served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Holst, Luke)
April 19, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiffs LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/10/2019 (des)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: AO 120 and copy of #1 Complaint mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (des)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC, Thomas Stanton. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Attorney Patrick E Brookhouser Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Gavilon Fertilizer LLC and MicroSource LLC. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019. (des)
April 19, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and Atty Holst - none found. (des)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922569) by Plaintiffs Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC, MicroSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Holst, Luke)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Eco Agro Resources, LLC, Eco World Group, LLC d/b/a Presidion Ag., Thomas Stanton ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2922511.), filed by MicroSource, LLC, Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 7/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '420 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '306 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - '008 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - '108 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 - '211 Patent Application, #6 Exhibit 6 - Patent Assignment Pages, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Holst, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MicroSource, LLC et al v. Eco World Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Agro Resources, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Represented By: Matthew A McGuire
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Kerndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco World Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Represented By: Matthew A McGuire
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Kerndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Stanton
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Represented By: Matthew A McGuire
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Kerndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavilon Fertilizer, LLC
Represented By: Luke C Holst
Represented By: Patrick E Brookhouser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MicroSource, LLC
Represented By: Luke C Holst
Represented By: Patrick E Brookhouser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?