Nielsen, Jr. v. City of Denison et al

Plaintiff: David Edward Nielsen, Jr
Defendant: City of Denison, The, Rogelio Valdez and Denison, City of
Case Number: 5:2019cv04017
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Sioux City before Judge CJ Williams. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 06/25/2019. (jjh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 6/26/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/12/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/12/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/12/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Motions due by 3/12/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 06/24/2019. (jjh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 6/24/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/18/2019. (pac)
June 17, 2019 Judge CJ Williams added (no conflicts identified). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider to case. (pac)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint by Denison, City of, Rogelio Valdez.(Phillips, Douglas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Clausen on behalf of Denison, City of, Rogelio Valdez. (Clausen, Zachary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas L Phillips on behalf of Denison, City of, Rogelio Valdez. (Phillips, Douglas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Edward Nielsen, Jr. Rogelio Valdez served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (O'Brien, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Edward Nielsen, Jr. Denison, City of served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Denison, The, Rogelio Valdez. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 5/26/2019. (skm)
April 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2927459.), filed by David Edward Nielsen, Jr.. Scheduling Report due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen, Jr. v. City of Denison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denison, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Valdez
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denison, City of
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edward Nielsen, Jr
Represented By: David A O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?