Horstman v. Lyon County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Horstman
Defendant: Laura Sievers and Lyon County, Iowa
Case Number: 5:2019cv04018
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Dustin Horstman, Lyon County, Iowa, Laura Sievers, this case is referred to a US Magistrate Judge for final disposition. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/21/2019. SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/2/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 10/7/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 10/28/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 12/16/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 1/8/2020. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 3/20/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/17/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/21/2019. (src)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 9:30 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please see dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Courts conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (Gollhofer, Jami)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' Answer to Complaint by Lyon County, Iowa, Laura Sievers.(Cain, Hugh) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (mmc).
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet attached. (mmc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Dustin Horstman. (mmc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/29/2019. (mmc)
April 29, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys, and KEM. (mmc)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Lyon County, case number LACV502354. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2928392), filed by Laura Sievers, Lyon County, Iowa. Scheduling Report due by 6/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cain, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horstman v. Lyon County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Horstman
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Thomas W Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Sievers
Represented By: Brent Hinders
Represented By: Eric Michael Updegraff
Represented By: Hugh J Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyon County, Iowa
Represented By: Brent Hinders
Represented By: Eric Michael Updegraff
Represented By: Hugh J Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?