Bowen v. Clausen et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Bowen
Defendant: Mapleton Iowa, Jared Clausen and Mapleton, Iowa, City of
Case Number: 5:2019cv04019
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED scheduling order) (Gollhofer, Jami)
July 1, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the presider. No conflicts identified. (src)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Clausen on behalf of Jared Clausen, Mapleton, Iowa, City of. (Clausen, Zachary)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by Jared Clausen, Mapleton, Iowa, City of.(Phillips, Douglas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jared Clausen and City of Mapleton. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 6/12/2019. (pac) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/14/2019 to correct plaintiff's last name) (pac).
May 13, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Jared Clausen, Mapleton Iowa ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2938211.), filed by Darrell Bowen. Scheduling Report due by 8/8/2019 (Bergmann, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Clausen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bowen
Represented By: Benjamin David Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapleton Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Clausen
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapleton, Iowa, City of
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?