Benoit v. Sioux County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Malinda Benoit
Defendant: Jason Bergsma, Judy Plendel, Sioux County, Iowa, Colleen McMahon, Ryan Sandbulte and Brent Deboer
Case Number: 5:2019cv04026
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Malinda Benoit (Wadding, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESISTANCE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Strike filed by Malinda Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Brief MOA in Support of Resistance to Defs Motion to Strike) (Wadding, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition & Jury Demand by Malinda Benoit (des)
June 25, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Strike by Defendants Jason Bergsma, Brent DeBoer, Colleen McMahon, Judy Plendel, Ryan Sandbulte, Sioux County, Iowa Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Phillips, Douglas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Sioux, case number LACV027941. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2967318), filed by Ryan Sandbulte, Brent Deboer, Judy Plendel, Jason Bergsma, Sioux County, Iowa, Colleen McMahon. Scheduling Report due by 8/23/2019 (Phillips, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit v. Sioux County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bergsma
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Plendel
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux County, Iowa
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen McMahon
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sandbulte
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Deboer
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Benoit
Represented By: Scott Michael Wadding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?