Van Holland v. Townley et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Van Holland
Defendant: Woodbury County Court Iowa Qualification Commission, Iowa Judicial Qualifications Commission, James Redmond, Deena Townley, Judge Jeffrey Neary and Woodbury County Court
Case Number: 5:2019cv04028
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and USCA Case Number 19-2573 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Joyce Van Holland. No documents have been filed in this case under seal. (src)
August 8, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed 7/19/2019 at #5 . Appeals court case number: 19-2573. Notification to print: #9 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #10 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (des)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Joyce Van Holland (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joyce Van Holland (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
August 7, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals Notice of Appeal filed 7/19/2019 at Doc no. #5 . Appeals court case number: 19-2573. Notification to print: #8 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT. (src)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT re #5 Notice of Appeal by Joyce Van Holland. Copy to filer at counter. Filed in this manner per PSLC. (src)
July 30, 2019 Set Fee Date Deadlines: Fee due by 8/23/2019. (kms)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Joyce Van Holland: Appellant is directed to either pay the $505 appellate filing and docketing fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 28 days of the date of this order. (kms)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #5 Pro Se Notice of Appeal. Case Number due by 7/26/2019. NOA/NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE of Appeal as to #4 Judgment by Joyce Van Holland. Copy to filer at counter. (src)
July 12, 2019 DOCKET Annotation: Court Orders Clerk's Office to Mail Copy of #2 Order to Iowa Attorney General's Office. (NEF and #2 Order Mailed to IAG) (mmc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Plaintiff take nothing and this action is dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/19. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Iowa Judicial Qualifications Commission, Jeffrey Neary, James Redmond, Deena Townley, Woodbury County Court, filed by Joyce Van Holland. Scheduling Report due by 10/8/2019 (ksy)(NEF to Plf)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.The clerk's office is directed to file the complaint (Doc. No. 1-1) as a new entry without the prepayment of the filing fee. After an initial review, I find that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and that her complaint is frivolous. Accordingly, her complaint is denied and this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/10/19. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joyce Van Holland. (NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Holland v. Townley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Van Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury County Court Iowa Qualification Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Judicial Qualifications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deena Townley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jeffrey Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?