Kluver v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Christine Kluver
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv04034
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) MDL No. 2741. This action is transferred to USDC Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 8/15/2019. (Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California) (des)
August 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 8/16/2019. (des) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/19/2019) (des).
July 17, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney - none found. Attorney admission verified for William P Baresel. IPM report verified for $400 Filing fee. Case opened in wrong division as case number 19cv80 - clerk notified Financial Department and attorney of corrected case number. (des)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Monsato ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2980731.), filed by Christine Kluver. Scheduling Report due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baresel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kluver v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Kluver
Represented By: William P Baresel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?