Hunt v. Principal Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary Hunt
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv04045
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #7 First Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (pac).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Principal Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc. for Principal Life Insurance Company. (Gray, Angela)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Complaint against Principal Life Insurance Company against Mary Hunt, filed by Mary Hunt. (Natwick, Jacob)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Defendant may have to and including 8/30/2019, to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/15/2019. (skm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company (Gray, Angela)
August 12, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/2/2019. (pac)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Mary Hunt. (pac)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/11/2019. (pac)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Sioux County, case number LACV028022 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2996352), filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Principal Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela J Gray
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hunt
Represented By: Jacob B Natwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?