Andersons, Inc, The v. Plymouth Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: The Andersons, Inc and Andersons, Inc, The
Defendant: Plymouth Energy, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04048
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROTECTIVE Order Granting #17 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/18/2019. (src)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Defendant Plymouth Energy, LLC (Dralle, Angela)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by The Andersons, Inc. Amended complaint due by 10/25/2019 (See Order text). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/10/2019. (des)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Plymouth Energy, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Lakeview Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate Plymouth Holdings USA, LLC for Plymouth Energy, LLC. (Dralle, Angela)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Plymouth Energy, LLC. Defendant's #12 answer shall be deemed as timely filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/25/2019. (jjh)
September 25, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2019. (mmc)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Plymouth Energy, LLC.(Dralle, Angela)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William John Miller on behalf of Plymouth Energy, LLC. (Miller, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 UNRESISTED Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Plymouth Energy, LLC (Dralle, Angela)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #6 and #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Larson Zalud and Attorney Nora K. Cook. on behalf of The Andersons, Inc. Upon a review of the Motions and Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. CM/ECF Registration form for Attorney Cook due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019. (NEF e-mailed to Atty Cook) (mmc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andersons, Inc, The re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Larson Zalud ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3014377), #5 Disclosure Statement LR 7.1, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nora K. Cook ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3014389) (Juarez, Cesar)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nora K. Cook ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3014389) by Plaintiff Andersons, Inc, The (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Juarez, Cesar)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Larson Zalud ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3014377) by Plaintiff Andersons, Inc, The (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Juarez, Cesar)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Andersons, Inc, The (Juarez, Cesar)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andersons, Inc, The re #3 Summons Returned Executed (Juarez, Cesar)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andersons, Inc, The. Plymouth Energy, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Juarez, Cesar)
August 23, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/13/2019 (des)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Plymouth Energy, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
August 23, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Plymouth Energy, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3005337.), filed by The Andersons, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 11/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Rider, #4 Exhibit C - Rider First Amendment, #5 Exhibit D - Assignment, #6 Exhibit E - Default Notice) (Juarez, Cesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersons, Inc, The v. Plymouth Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Andersons, Inc
Represented By: Cesar Augusto Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andersons, Inc, The
Represented By: Cesar Augusto Juarez
Represented By: Eric Larson Zalud
Represented By: Nora K Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plymouth Energy, LLC
Represented By: William John Miller
Represented By: Angela Ellen Dralle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?