Ries v. Dobbs
Petitioner: Justin Stephen Ries
Respondent: Warden Bryan K Dobbs
Case Number: 5:2019cv04061
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE Correspondence by Justin Stephen Ries. Response/NEF mailed to filer. (src)
September 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated re #6 Judgment - Habeas. (src)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT on Habeas Corpus Petition. Petitioners Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief pursuant to 28 USC 2241 is denied. Judgment is entered in favor of Respondent in this case. Petitioner take nothing and this action is dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 09/25/2019. Judgment/NEF mailed to petitioner. (src)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Petitioner is not required to pay the 28 U.S.C. section 1914(a) filing fee. Petitioner's claim is denied and this case is dismissed. Petitioner's motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. #4 ) is denied as moot. The clerk's office is directed to file a copy of this order in petitioner's original criminal case. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 09/25/2019. Order/NEF mailed to filer. (src)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Justin Stephen Ries (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Justin Stephen Ries. Dismissal Deadline 1/5/2020. (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Pro Se Motion to file 2241 petition under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/23/2019. (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION to file 2241 petition under seal by Petitioner Justin Stephen Ries (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef to non-ecf filer) (des) Modified on 9/23/2019 (des).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ries v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Stephen Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Bryan K Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?