Koziol v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Koziol
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv04068
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (src)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Lynn Koziol Proof of Service by Certified Mail (Buckley, Andrea)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J McLaughlin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (McLaughlin, Martin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carrington, Melissa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New SS Case Packet) (ksy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Deborah Lynn Koziol. Dismissal Deadline 1/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/15/19. (ksy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/14/2019. (mmc)
October 15, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts; none found. (mmc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Deborah Lynn Koziol (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buckley, Andrea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2019) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koziol v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Martin J McLaughlin
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Koziol
Represented By: Andrea Hiatt Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?