Schiebout v. Sioux County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Kamie Jo Schiebout
Defendant: Judy Plendel, Sioux County, Iowa, Brenda Snieder, Antonio Mora and Colleen McMahon
Case Number: 5:2019cv04077
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mandel Sandy on behalf of Kamie Jo Schiebout. (Sandy, John)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2021 08:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/13/2019. (kms) Modified on 12/16/2019 to correct pretrial order date (skm).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 12/16/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/3/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/2/2020. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 5/4/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/4/2020. Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Motions due by 9/3/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 3/22/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/12/2019. (jjh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (kms)
December 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned as presider to the case (conflicts checked; none found) (per KEM Chambers). (skm)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearings. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 11:30 AM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Colleen McMahon, Antonio Mora, Judy Plendel, Sioux County, Iowa, Brenda Snieder.(Phillips, Douglas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation : Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (kms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Kamie Jo Schiebout. (kms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2019. (kms)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. NO conflicts identified. (kms)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Clausen on behalf of Colleen McMahon, Antonio Mora, Judy Plendel, Sioux County, Iowa, Brenda Snieder. (Clausen, Zachary)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Sioux, case number LACV028206. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3065532), filed by Antonio Mora, Colleen McMahon, Judy Plendel, Sioux County, Iowa, Brenda Snieder. Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2020 (Phillips, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiebout v. Sioux County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamie Jo Schiebout
Represented By: John Mandel Sandy
Represented By: Scott Michael Wadding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Plendel
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux County, Iowa
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Snieder
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Mora
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen McMahon
Represented By: Douglas L Phillips
Represented By: Zachary David Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?