Nunes, et al v. Lizza, et al
Plaintiff: NuStar Farms, LLC, Anthony Nunes, III and Anthony Nunes, Jr.
Defendant: Ryan Lizza and Hearst Magazine Media, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv04003
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 ***TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the court on #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donnellan; #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Boyer; and #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sitwala on behalf of Defendants Hearst Magazine Media, Inc. and Ryan Lizza. Upon review of the Motions and Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2020. (ksy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ravi V. Sitwala ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3145092) by Defendants Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sitwala-2474262, Ravi)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathaniel S. Boyer ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3145081) by Defendants Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Boyer, Nathaniel)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan R. Donnellan ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3144977) by Defendants Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Donnellan, Jonathan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Hearst Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Hearst Communications, Inc. for Hearst Magazine Media, Inc. (Elgin, Susan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Patricia Elgin on behalf of Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza. (Elgin, Susan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Klinefeldt on behalf of Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza. (Klinefeldt, Nicholas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Giudicessi on behalf of Hearst Magazine Media, Inc, Ryan Lizza. (Giudicessi, Michael)
February 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Nunes, Jr, Anthony Nunes, III, NuStar Farms, LLC. All Defendants. (Biss, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the court on the #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven S. Biss on behalf of Plaintiffs NuStar Farms, LLC, Anthony Nunes, Jr, and Anthony Nunes, III. Upon a review of the Motion and Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2020. (skm)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven S. Biss ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3128460) by Plaintiffs NuStar Farms, LLC, Anthony Nunes, Jr, Anthony Nunes, III (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Feller, Joseph)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Financial Interest Disclosure Statement by NuStar Farms, LLC, Anthony Nunes, Jr, Anthony Nunes, III (Feller, Joseph)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Ryan Lizza. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Demand against Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Ryan Lizza ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3112499.), filed by Anthony Nunes, Jr, Anthony Nunes, III, NuStar Farms, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Feller, Joseph)
January 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
January 16, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/6/2020. (ksy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes, et al v. Lizza, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NuStar Farms, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nunes, III
Represented By: Joseph M Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nunes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Magazine Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?