Scottsdale Insurance Company v. 59 Power Sports, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: 59 Power Sports, Inc, Jaime L. Huls, Peggy Monier, Jerry Monier, E H, Daniel R Huls, EH and Jaime L Huls
Case Number: 5:2020cv04018
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EH, Daniel R Huls, Jaime L Huls, Jerry Monier, Peggy Monier.(Galligan, Brian)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P Galligan on behalf of EH, Daniel R Huls, Jaime L Huls, Jerry Monier, Peggy Monier. (Galligan, Brian)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. EH waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Jaime L Huls waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Daniel R Huls waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by 59 Power Sports, Inc (Wright, Jeff)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 59 Power Sports, Inc, Jerry Monier, Peggy Monier.(Wright, Jeff)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Peggy Monier served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Jerry Monier served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. 59 Power Sports, Inc served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Reitz, Kathleen)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Reitz, Kathleen)
March 17, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/7/2020. (mmc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
March 17, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (mmc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 59 Power Sports, Inc, E H, Daniel R Huls, Jaime L. Huls, Jerry Monier, Peggy Monier ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3161869.), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 6/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reitz, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. 59 Power Sports, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 59 Power Sports, Inc
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime L. Huls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Monier
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Monier
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R Huls
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EH
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime L Huls
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Li Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?