Henrich et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jack Henrich and Marjorie Henrich
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv04024
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-212) MDL No. 2741. This action is transferred to USDC Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 6/1/2020. (Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California) (des)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Craig, Jason)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Craig, Jason)
May 20, 2020 ***Attorney Joseph J Heidenreich for Plaintiffs Jack Henrich and Marjorie Henrich added. Mr Heidenreich has complied with the requirements set out in #4 Notice. (pac)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the Northern District of Iowa (eAtty Jorde, eAtty Domina, eAtty Heidenreich) (jag)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (eAtty Jorde, eAtty Domina, eAtty Heidenreich) (jag)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jack Henrich, Marjorie Henrich (eAtty Jorde, eAtty Domina, eAtty Heidenreich) (jag)
May 19, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/9/2020 (jag)
May 19, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Sac County, case number LACV020051. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3201712), filed by Monsanto Company. Scheduling Report due by 7/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information, #2 State Court Return of Original Notice, #3 State Court Petition and Jury Demand, #4 State Court Original Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Craig, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henrich et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Henrich
Represented By: Joseph J Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Henrich
Represented By: Joseph J Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?