Slater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alan Karl Slater
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv04038
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alan Karl Slater. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Wicklund, Edward)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A Wicklund on behalf of Plaintiff Alan Karl Slater. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney registers for NextGen by 7/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/30/2020. (eAtty Wicklund) (des) (des).
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des)
June 30, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3236197) by Plaintiff Alan K. Slater (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Kappelman, Wes)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3236181.), filed by Alan K. Slater. Dismissal Deadline 9/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2020: #2 Exhibit A) (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Karl Slater
Represented By: Edward Allen Wicklund
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?