Bohnenkamp et al v. Hog Slat, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. and Honey Haulers, Inc
Defendant: Hog Slat, Inc, USA Solutions and Hog Slat Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv04043
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Amend and Remand to State Court. See order text. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/14/2020. (mmc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2020 re #13 Motion to Amend #12 First Amended Complaint filed by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. The motion is taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Resistance to Defendant Hog Slat, Inc.'s #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs have to and including 10/27/2020 to file their resistance to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 10/7/20. (djs)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Resistance to Defendant Hog Slat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc (Briese, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint filed by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. (Briese, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 11:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please use dial-in hearing instructions to participate) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/01/2020. (Gollhofer, Jami)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hog Slat Inc Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Goodhue, Thomas) Modified texton 9/30/2020 (ksy).
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESISTANCE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand filed by Hog Slat Inc. (Goodhue, Thomas)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc re #15 Order, Notice re: Citizenship (Briese, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #12 Amended Complaint by USA Solutions.(Gray, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Hog Slat Inc Principal Place of Business (Goodhue, Thomas)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO ESTABLISH JURISDICTION: It is Ordered that on or before 10/8/2020, Defendant Hog Slat, Defendant Honey Haulers, and Plaintiff Bohnenkamp should submit notices to the court of their citizenship. Defendants Hog Slat and Honey Haulers should name their principal place of business, and Plaintiff Bohnenkamp should name the state where he resides and is a citizen of. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/24/2020. (mmc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 RESISTANCE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. (Briese, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Amend First Amended Petition) (Briese, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Honey Haulers, Inc, Roger Bohnenkamp. Waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020 (Briese, David) Modified to add deadline text on 10/13/2020 (des)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Honey Haulers, Inc (Briese, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by USA Solutions (Gray, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Resistance to Defendant Hog Slat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. Plaintiffs shall have to and including 9/22/2020 to file their resistance to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/9/2020. (jag)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Resistance to Defendant Hog Slat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc (Briese, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Hog Slat Inc (Goodhue, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff Honey Haulers, Inc., LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (skm)
September 4, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant USA Solutions LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2020. (skm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gray on behalf of USA Solutions. (Gray, John)
September 1, 2020 Set Deadline: Check Status Deadline for Annual Attorney Fee payment due by 9/15/2020 from Justin Vondrak. (ksy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Attorneys. (ksy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hog Slat, Inc Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Goodhue, Thomas) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (ksy).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please see attached New Removal Case Packet. (ksy)
August 19, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant Hog Slat Inc's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/8/2020. (ksy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition by Roger Bohnenkamp, Honey Haulers, Inc. (ksy)
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court of in and for Plymouth County, case number LACV039922. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3267847), filed by Hog Slat, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Rule 81(a) Statement, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #5 Errata Exhibit D to Defendants' Resistance to Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude and Limit Evidence) (Goodhue, Thomas) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ksy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohnenkamp et al v. Hog Slat, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hog Slat, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Solutions
Represented By: John C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hog Slat Inc
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Bohnenkamp
Represented By: Justin Ryan Vondrak
Represented By: David Christen Briese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honey Haulers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honey Haulers, Inc
Represented By: Justin Ryan Vondrak
Represented By: David Christen Briese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?