Bender v. Iowa, State of et al
Plaintiff: Noel Jermaine Bender
Defendant: Department of Corrections and Iowa, State of
Case Number: 5:2020cv04045
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #4 MOTION to Amend by Noel Jermaine Bender. (NEF mailed to petitioner) (pac)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Noel Jermaine Bender (ksy)(NEF w/2254 packets to Pet)(PSLC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Amend by Petitioner Noel Jermaine Bender (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(Nef mailed to petitioner). (ac) Modified on 10/5/2020 (ac).
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Noel Jermaine Bender (ksy)(NEF to Pet)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Noel Jermaine Bender (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Noel Jermaine Bender. Dismissal Deadline 12/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ksy)(NEF w/extra copy to Plf)(PSLC)
August 21, 2020 FEE Receipt: $ 5.00, receipt number IAN110027667 for Habeas Filing Fee by Noel Jermaine Bender (ksy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Iowa, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Jermaine Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?